MathScore EduFighter is one of the best math games on the Internet today. You can start playing for free!

## Estimated Multiplication - Sample Math Practice Problems

The math problems below can be generated by MathScore.com, a math practice program for schools and individual families. References to complexity and mode refer to the overall difficulty of the problems as they appear in the main program. In the main program, all problems are automatically graded and the difficulty adapts dynamically based on performance. Answers to these sample questions appear at the bottom of the page. This page does not grade your responses.

Want unlimited math worksheets? Learn more about our online math practice software.
See some of our other supported math practice problems.

### Complexity=4

Estimate the product by rounding numbers to the first digit, and then doing mental multiplication.

1.   55 × 94 ≈
 60
 45,000
 450
 5,400
2.   73 × 43 ≈
 280
 28,000
 2,800
 40,000

### Complexity=5

Estimate the product by rounding numbers to the first digit, and then doing mental multiplication.

1.   57 × 259 ≈
 18,000
 1,200
 10,000
 100,000
 1,500
2.   43 × 550 ≈
 200,000
 2,400
 250,000
 300,000
 24,000

### Complexity=4

Estimate the product by rounding numbers to the first digit, and then doing mental multiplication.

155 × 94 ≈
 60
 45,000
 450
 5,400
Solution
55 × 94 ≈ 60 × 90 = 5,400
The exact answer would be 55 × 94 = 5,170.
273 × 43 ≈
 280
 28,000
 2,800
 40,000
Solution
73 × 43 ≈ 70 × 40 = 2,800
The exact answer would be 73 × 43 = 3,139.

### Complexity=5

Estimate the product by rounding numbers to the first digit, and then doing mental multiplication.

157 × 259 ≈
 18,000
 1,200
 10,000
 100,000
 1,500
Solution
57 × 259 ≈ 60 × 300 = 18,000
The exact answer would be 57 × 259 = 14,763.